QUEENSBRIDGE PRIMARY PARENT & TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR PTA SUPPORTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF ALL THE PUPILS ATTENDING QUEENSBRIDGE PRIMARY SCHOOL BY ORGANISING AND MANAGING FUND RAISING ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 09 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Schmidt Risak | Chair | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rafael Lesbaupin Plantier | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Williams | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Lim | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.79k | £29.73k | £16.38k | £15.08k | £22.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.66k | £58.67k | £40.77k | £15.93k | £21.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL, 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS, 2.3 SEEKING TO PROCURE THAT (I) THE IDENTITY OF MEMBERS AND THE COMMITTEE MEMBERS/TRUSTEES REFLECTS THE DIVERSITY OF THE PUPIL, PARENT, CARER AND STAFF POPULATION AND (II) THE ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS UNDERTAKEN AND THE SUBSEQUENT USE OF FUNDS ALSO TAKE ACCOUNT OF THAT DIVERSITY, BOTH TO THE EXTENT REASONABLY PRACTICABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Queensbridge Primary School
Queensbridge Road
LONDON
E8 3ND
- Phone:
- 07825172034
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window