Financial history REVIVAL CHURCH, BILLERICAY

Charity number: 1172339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £76.23k £83.05k £76.75k £80.71k £114.46k
Total expenditure £72.86k £69.90k £73.38k £80.04k £90.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £361 N/A N/A £1.00k