FIRST GOOLE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 509454
Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting in accordance with The Scout Association Training Programme for 6 to 25 year olds and The Scout Association Policy and Rules

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020

Total income: £14,250
Total expenditure: £13,011

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 December 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Caitlin Louise Kelly Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.52k £8.59k £8.36k £9.63k £14.25k
Total expenditure £8.64k £5.92k £6.51k £11.18k £13.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 June 2021 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SCOUT HUT
DUNHILL ROAD
GOOLE
DN14 6TN
Phone:
01405497578
Website:

goolescouts.org.uk