BELVOIR CASTLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and historical
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 08 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Most Noble RACHAEL EMMA LOUISE DUCHESS OF RUTLAND | Chair | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
GILES HERCHARD MOUNSEY-HEYSHAM | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HERBERT LANE | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|||||
OLIVER HENRY JAMES STOCKEN CBE | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
The Most Noble DAVID CHARLES ROBERT DUKE OF RUTLAND | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £4.88k | £69.91k | £27.37k | £71.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THOSE PARTS OF BELVOIR CASTLE WHICH ARE OPEN TO THE PUBLIC; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO PROMOTE THE STUDY, APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF BELVOIR CASTLE IN ITS HISTORICAL, CULTURAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND SOCIAL CONTEXTS; (C) TO ADVANCE THE ARTS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY USING BELVOIR CASTLE AND ITS FACILITIES AND OFFERING INTERNSHIPS TO YOUNG PEOPLE; AND (D) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Berry Accountants Ltd
Bowden House
36 Northampton Road
MARKET HARBOROUGH
LE16 9HE
- Phone:
- 01858467474
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window