Trustees THE EMPIRE THEATRE (MERSEYSIDE) TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 509458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sean Patrick Marley Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
John Joseph Thompson Trustee 14 May 2018
None on record
Pamela Joyce McGaffney Trustee 14 March 2016
None on record
Lesley Marshall Trustee 07 July 2015
None on record
David Morgan Trustee 19 June 1997
None on record
HIS HONOUR GEORGE ANTHONY ENSOR Trustee 20 November 1991
None on record