GENIE IN THE GUTTER LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
**LIQUIDATION** GENIE IN THE GUTTER SUPPORTS PEOPLE IN LIVERPOOL TO RECOVER FROM ADDICTION, RECLAIM THEIR LIVES & REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL. WE PROVIDE A WIDE RANGE OF ACTIVITIES & INTERVENTIONS, INCLUDING: 1:1 SUPPORT, THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONS, DAILY ACTIVITIES & CLASSES, E.G. 12-STEP & OTHER RECOVERY THEMED MEETINGS, DIGITAL INCLUSION, WELLBEING AND ARTS INITIATIVES, AND CULTURAL VISITS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 May 2017: Standard registration
- 29 August 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JAN 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE:- 1) TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE DEPENDENT, FORMERLY DEPENDENT OR OTHERWISE AFFECTED BY DRUG OR ALCOHOL ADDICTION THROUGH THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROFESSIONAL THEATRE AND FILM PRODUCTIONS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC WITH A VIEW TO PREVENTING PERSONS TO BECOMING DEPENDENT OR OTHERWISE AFFECTED BY DRUG OR ALCOHOL ADDICTION THROUGH THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO PROFESSIONAL THEATRE AND FILM PRODUCTIONS. 3) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE BOARD SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window