EVA CRANE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(i) The advancement of the science of apiology. (ii) Promoting, financing, organising and carrying on and encouraging bee research for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 October 2017: CIO registration
- 21 November 2018: Funds received from 1091647 EVA CRANE TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH RICHARD JONES | Chair | 18 March 2002 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Scott | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jozef van der Steen | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Dirk de Graaf | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROF ROSEMARY AGNES COOPER | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.50k | £115.40k | £82.34k | £72.94k | £95.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.42k | £239.04k | £184.21k | £223.85k | £159.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SCIENCE OF APIOLOGY AND TO PROMOTE, FINANCE AND ORGANISE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF BEE RESEARCH AND THE HISTORY OF BEE RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Keigwin
Sully Rd
Penarth
CF64 2TP
- Phone:
- 07786955046
- Email:
- mail@evacranetrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window