MOTHERS CHARITY

Charity Number: 1173209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Make grants to individual who are in need to financial difficulties for education and training , medical treatment and relief of poverty.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £26,510
Total expenditure: £26,427

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 May 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LISSY UNNIKRISHNAN Chair 06 January 2017
None on record
Sajini Kadavil Abraham Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
BEENA JAMES Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
ANITHA GIRISH KAIPALLY Trustee 31 March 2019
None on record
SIJIMOLE ABRAHAM Trustee 31 March 2019
None on record
LEELA BABY Trustee 06 January 2017
ST.MARY'S JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH, HAMPSHIRE
Received: 21 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £29.64k £34.33k £26.52k £25.18k £26.51k
Total expenditure £31.56k £34.08k £27.23k £24.95k £26.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 27 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 29 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 29 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 27 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 27 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 13 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 18 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 CAMELLIA GARDENS
SOUTHAMPTON
SO18 2RR
Phone:
07853937786
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available