Accounts and annual returns THE TONYPANDY GRAMMAR SCHOOL PRIZE ICW MID RHONDDA COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL

Charity number: 509471
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 28 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 28 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 10 November 2008 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required