THE10THDAY.COM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The10thDay.com is an Imam Hussain awareness organisation. Our single goal is to increase the awareness of Hussain and the lessons learnt from the story of Karbala.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYED FAIZ RAZA HAMDANI | Chair | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Abbas Madjidi | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
HAMED HESHMATI RAFSANJANI | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.08k | £26.70k | £16.86k | £66.69k | £38.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.32k | £29.66k | £10.61k | £58.36k | £23.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 June 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 June 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND TENETS OF THE ‘SHIA ITHNA ASHARI’ BRANCH OF THE MUSLIM FAITH INCLUDING THE MESSAGE OF MONOTHEISM, EQUALITY AND HARMONY WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 DENISON ROAD
MANCHESTER
M14 5SQ
- Phone:
- 07971145827
- Email:
- info@the10thday.com
- Website:
-
THE10THDAY.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window