Trustees ST MICHAELS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1171326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIGITTE WATKINS Chair 05 March 2025
None on record
Chris Young Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Clare Young Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Rachel Barnes Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Pamela Louise Wilson Mrs Trustee 06 February 2024
None on record
Emma Elizabeth Mulholland Trustee 05 February 2020
None on record
ANGELA CAMIER Trustee 30 November 2016
None on record
CATHERINE HEDGES Trustee 30 September 2011
None on record
TRACEY POOLEMAN Trustee 30 September 2001
None on record