Financial history BASIC INCOME RESEARCH GROUP

Charity number: 1171533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.42k £2.75k £2.75k £2.00k £2.10k
Total expenditure £3.07k £514 £514 £81 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A