FASHION REVOLUTION FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT AND COMPLIANCE, EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PERSONS WHO ARE INVOLVED IN OR CUSTOMERS OF THE FASHION, CLOTHING, FOOTWEAR, ACCESSORIES AND TEXTILES MANUFACTURING AND SUPPLY CHAIN, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SUFFERING AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HUMAN RIGHTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Cambodia
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Guatemala
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Kenya
- Kuwait
- Liberia
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malaysia
- Mexico
- Morocco
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Serbia
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uruguay
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 14 June 2017: Standard registration
- 08 April 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 08 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1159356 THE LABOUR BEHIND THE LABEL TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.74k | £13.42k | £29.73k | £20.14k | £33.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.87k | £540 | £5.11k | £7.27k | £26.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 20 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
4. THE FOUNDATION’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) THE PROMOTION OF ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT AND COMPLIANCE WITH APPLICABLE LAWS AND REGULATIONS BY PERSONS AND BUSINESSES IN SUCH COUNTRIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME WHO ARE INVOLVED IN OR WHO ARE CUSTOMERS OF THE FASHION, CLOTHING, FOOTWEAR, ACCESSORIES AND TEXTILES MANUFACTURING AND SUPPLY CHAIN INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, FARMERS, PRODUCERS, MANUFACTURERS, BUYERS, DESIGNERS, RETAILERS, SUPPLIERS, WORKERS IN ANY SUCH BUSINESSES, CUSTOMERS OF ANY SUCH BUSINESSES AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY; (B) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PERSONS WHO ARE INVOLVED IN OR CUSTOMERS OF THE FASHION, CLOTHING, FOOTWEAR, ACCESSORIES AND TEXTILES MANUFACTURING AND SUPPLY CHAIN INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, FARMERS, PRODUCERS, MANUFACTURERS, BUYERS, DESIGNERS, RETAILERS, SUPPLIERS, WORKERS IN ANY SUCH BUSINESSES, CUSTOMERS OF ANY SUCH BUSINESSES AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY CONCERNING SOUND EMPLOYMENT PRACTICES AND ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY THROUGHOUT THE FASHION, CLOTHING, FOOTWEAR, ACCESSORIES AND TEXTILES MANUFACTURING AND SUPPLY CHAINS, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THROUGH ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF TEACHING, TRAINING, PUBLISHING, EXHIBITIONS, EVENTS, SEMINARS AND OTHER MEANS OF PROVIDING EDUCATION SERVICES AND RESOURCES; (C) THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN SUCH COUNTRIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME THROUGH, AMONG OTHER THINGS, THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND MAKING AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC REPORTS ON THE ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT ACROSS THE FASHION, CLOTHING, FOOTWEAR, ACCESSORIES AND TEXTILES MANUFACTURING AND SUPPLY CHAINS AND THE PROMOTION OF THE PRACTICE OF RE-CYCLING AND RE-USE OF CLOTHING; (D) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SUFFERING IN SUCH COUNTRIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME; (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HUMAN RIGHTS AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS BY INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS AND ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS; IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE DIRECTORS SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE DIRECTORS ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE FOUNDATION TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE FOUNDATION CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS; AND (3) ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window