Financial history BRIXTON WINGS

Charity number: 1173571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £33.26k £47.70k £58.05k £48.97k £45.00k
Total expenditure £18.20k £41.54k £49.08k £44.58k £46.00k
Income from government contracts £275 N/A N/A N/A £21.00k
Income from government grants N/A £6.14k £19.97k £25.72k £20.00k