Financial history RED KITE FAMILY CENTRE

Charity number: 1171250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £105.04k £98.33k £59.18k £63.65k £148.60k
Total expenditure £90.66k £82.58k £90.64k £89.75k £98.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k £11.00k £17.68k £12.75k