Financial history DISABILITY AFRICA

Charity number: 1172163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £123.36k £146.36k £188.85k £149.17k £168.79k
Total expenditure £181.34k £116.11k £164.33k £188.63k £159.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A