BIG FUTURES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support children from disadvantaged backgrounds from five years old, right through to when they start work. Our goal is to help children succeed in school, in work, and in life. We do this by providing free counselling sessions and Family Activity Groups for children and their families, to help children and their families improve their emotional wellbeing, resilience and life skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 June 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE DOUGLAS | Chair | 21 December 2016 |
|
|||||
EMMA JAMES | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Marmion-Lennon | Trustee | 22 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Main | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY HODGSON | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr SEAN SWEENEY | Trustee | 21 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL ATWELL | Trustee | 21 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR KLAYS | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.87k | £34.52k | £89.23k | £108.82k | £102.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.44k | £55.77k | £74.20k | £96.82k | £119.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). 2) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 CHESTNUT AVENUE
YORK
YO31 1BR
- Phone:
- 07503 493441
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window