Financial history THE INVISIBLE FRIENDS

Charity number: 1172532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £6.94k £2.92k £5.67k £4.85k £6.56k
Total expenditure £15.77k £845 £2.83k £7.82k £7.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A