STUBBINGTON U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer the opportunity for members to attend any of over 50 groups covering any activity where sufficient interest has been shown, this can be in peoples homes or more formal venues, dependent on numbers interested. Members are welcome to lead an interest group or assist in it. Our activities range from Walking, Cribbage, Choir, Geneology, Art, Fishing, History & Psychology to name but a few.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
Governance
- 21 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Roy HATHAWAY | Chair | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Reed | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Hercliffe | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Bird | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Simpson | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Herbertson | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francis John Ponting | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jennet PADDEY | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Francis Young | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Yorke | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Crockford | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Anthony Randall | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.83k | £22.53k | £5.90k | £8.41k | £9.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.81k | £6.05k | £9.05k | £8.35k | £9.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 Meadowbank Road
FAREHAM
Hampshire
PO15 5LF
- Phone:
- 01329841308
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window