Financial history HULL TURKISH EDUCATION SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1173904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.92k £10.75k £17.14k £27.23k £14.56k
Total expenditure £16.14k £9.25k £16.38k £26.43k £31.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A