Trustees HULL TURKISH EDUCATION SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1173904

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ayse Ozkurt | Chair | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
yilmaz aydemir | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Omer Ozer | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ayse Hasanbasoglu | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MEHMET OZKURT | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muhsin Nas | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
NAFIZ HASANBASOGLU | Trustee | 31 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ismail Dogan | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mehmet Hancer | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Talip Nas | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
ADEM TARHAN | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.