SWANSEA COMMUNITY WORKSHOPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Swansea Community Workshops is a collection of fully equipped workshops in central Swansea which provide the opportunity for men and women to do practical projects (wood, metal, plastic,etc), and, at the same time, to acquire skills from other members. The practical projects may be for personal benefit, or making products for sale, or tasks commissioned by outside parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,690 from 6 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 10 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bradley Ewers | Chair | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Alexander | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David priscott | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Day | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Munn | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
John O'Brien | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.51k | £44.14k | £34.90k | £11.33k | £38.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.90k | £13.83k | £25.26k | £23.16k | £37.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.00k | £12.55k | £4.00k | £26.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE {PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEN AGED 18 OR OVER/OLDER MEN/OLDER MEN AND WOMEN}, WITHIN SWANSEA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL). FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE /MEN IN SWANSEA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED, UNEMPLOYED OR HAVE HEALTH PROBLEMS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR HOBBIES, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION INCLUDING PRACTICAL INTERESTS, SKILLS SHARING, THE LEARNING OF NEW SKILLS, AND HELPING WITH COMMUNITY BASED PROJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
208 High Street
SWANSEA
SA1 1PE
- Phone:
- 01792642868
- Email:
- info@sccw.org.uk
- Website:
-
sccw.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window