TRINITY FIELDS PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils accessing the school in particular by developing effective relationships between staff, parents and children by running family events throughout the year at the school which all families can access. We provide equipment , resources, and facilities which support the school and pupils education formally and informally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Caerphilly
Governance
- 01 February 2017: Standard registration
- TRINITY FIELDS SCHOOL & RESOURCE CENTRE (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERALDINE SMALLMAN | Chair | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Sapey | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Barker | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
LEANNE BOARDMAN | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.94k | £58.31k | £1.42k | £17.16k | £10.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.20k | £57.92k | £2.61k | £3.05k | £72.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 274 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 July 2021 | 368 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY FIELDS SPECIAL SCHOOL
CAERPHILLY ROAD
YSTRAD MYNACH
HENGOED
CF82 7XW
- Phone:
- 01443866000
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window