Financial history Senacre Wood Primary School Parents and Teachers Association

Charity Number: 1173873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.58k £1.78k £1.28k £5.92k £8.07k
Total expenditure £2.54k £1.60k £3.11k £2.43k £5.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A