SANT BABA JOGINDER SINGH JI DOMELI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Sikh religion in accordance with Sri Guru Granth Sahib Ji. In particular but not exclusively by, the provision of a centre for religious worship and ancillary educational activities, fostering brotherhood between Sikhs and all faiths and the preaching, preservation and practice of the Sikh principles which have been laid by the Guru's.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
64 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 31 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOGINDER SINGH | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
FUTI SINGH | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gurutegh SINGH | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.45k | £164.19k | £278.62k | £255.94k | £181.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.16k | £61.22k | £37.94k | £26.51k | £47.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF SRI GURU GRANTH SAHIB, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROVISION OF CENTRES OR SCHOOLS OR OTHER ESTABLISHMENTS FOR RELIGIOUS WORSHIP AND ANCILLARY EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES; B) FOSTERING BROTHERHOOD BETWEEN SIKHS IN PARTICULAR AND ALSO ALL FAITHS IN GENERAL; C) THE PREACHING, PRESERVATION AND PRACTICE OF THE SIKH TENETS IN THE MANNER ORIGINALLY LAID DOWN BY THE TEN GURUS; D) THE PROVISION OF ALL NECESSARY RELIGIOUS SERVICES AS REQUIRED BY THE SIKH FAITH AND THE PROVISION OF SPIRITUAL WELLBEING; 2) THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD EYE HEALTH IN THE PUNJAB REGION OF INDIA BY THE PROVISION OF A MEDICAL TEAM TO DETECT AND PREVENT EARLY SIGNS OF BLINDNESS AND VISUAL IMPAIRMENT IN INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gurdwara Pita Kalu Sahib
Cherry Orchard Road
Handsworth Wood
B20 2NG
- Phone:
- 07967789937
- Email:
- office@gpks.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window