CONNEXIONS COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Connexions Community Hub is a registered charity, and has become a focal point in the town, bringing the community together in over 12 activities each week. With rooms available for hire, as well as activities such as a Youth Club, Colouring Club, Arts and Crafts, Karate, Open Days and Coffee Mornings organised by Trustees and Volunteers. The project focuses on the whole community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 21 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICK CRAIG | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kay Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Hughes | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHARLES WILLIAM SHAW | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUE | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2019 | 01/08/2020 | 01/08/2021 | 01/08/2022 | 01/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.34k | £21.18k | £30.59k | £42.10k | £53.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.78k | £12.47k | £21.97k | £32.00k | £42.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.24k | £22.07k | £9.04k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO ARE: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GAINSBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 ACLAND STREET
GAINSBOROUGH
DN21 2LN
- Phone:
- 01427330640
- Email:
- craig_richard@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window