GURDWARA GURU NANAK PARKASH, COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gurudwara (Sikh Temple)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income:
£1,045,520
Donations and legacies | £1.01m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £38.59k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£708,171
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £605.69k | |
Other | £102.48k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £102.48k | |
Charitable expenditure | £605.69k | |
Retained for future use | £337.35k |
People

14 Employee(s)
21 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Coventry City
Governance
- 10 January 1980: Standard registration
- GURUDWARA GURU NANAK PARKASH, COVENTRY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amarjit Singh Khatra | Chair | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gurjeet Singh | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohinder Singh | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dalwinder Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SITAL AMRIK SINGH SOHAL | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Major Singh | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Galen Singh Bahia | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daljit Dhami | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jagroop Singh | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simranpal Singh | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kashmir Singh Johal | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jaswinder Singh | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gulvinder Singh Liddar | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pargat Singh | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jaswinder Kaur Thandi | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hardip Kaur Shergill | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Inderpal Singh Sangha | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pardeep Singh | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kulwant Singh Manak | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harpal Singh | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Narinder Kaur | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.86k | £565.47k | £719.45k | £959.60k | £1.05m | |
|
Total expenditure | £272.23k | £280.28k | £453.08k | £554.52k | £708.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £486.22k | £705.05k | £946.27k | £1.01m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £12.60k | £14.40k | £13.33k | £38.59k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £66.65k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £14.52k | £501.20k | £605.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £280.28k | £392.81k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £14.52k | £3.78k | £3.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £45.74k | £53.31k | £102.48k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £4.65m | £4.72m | £5.02m | £5.94m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £170.21k | £218.18k | £323.71k | £349.78k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £162.90k | £17.38k | £15.96k | £626.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12 JULY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 9 MARCH 1998 as amended on 19 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE SIKH RELIGION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL THINK FIT:- (A)THE MAINTENANCE OF A TEMPLE FOR WORSHIP; (B)THE CELEBRATION OF SIKH RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS; (C)THE CONDUCT OF BAPTISM, MARRIAGE AND FUNERAL RITES IN ACCORDANCE WITH SIKH RELIGIOUS OBSERVANCE; (D)THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A LIBRARY CONTAINING BOOKS IN PUNJABI AND ENGLISH ON SIKH RELIGION, HISTORY AND CULTURE; (E)THE INSTRUCTION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN SIKH RELIGIOUS PRINCIPLES AND PROMOTING THE APPLICATION OF THOSE PRINCIPLES GENERALLY TO RELATIONSHIPS WITHIN AND OUTSIDE THE SIKH COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
71-81 HARNALL LANE WEST
COVENTRY
CV1 4FB
- Phone:
- 02476226057
- Email:
- info@ggnpcoventry.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window