THE ELIZABETH COTEMAN FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial, practical and emotional support to those diagnosed with pancreatic cancer and their families/carers through appropriate referral and signposting in a way that will improve quality of life. Supporting research into pancreatic cancer. Working in partnership to achieve better outcomes. The charity operates across the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERALD COTEMAN | Chair | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEMMA COTEMAN | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMMA LANE | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LAURA COTEMAN | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.45k | £10.13k | £2.72k | £5.79k | £4.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.97k | £3.61k | £10.56k | £8.63k | £7.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONG INDIVIDUALS, FAMILIES AND GROUPS LIVING WITH A DIAGNOSIS OF PANCREATIC CANCER OR PANCREATITIS BY: • OFFERING GRANTS TO THOSE GROUPS WORKING WITH INDIVIDUALS, FAMILIES AND GROUPS LIVING WITH A DIAGNOSIS OF PANCREATIC CANCER OR PANCREATITIS. • OFFERING GRANTS TO NHS CLINICAL PANCREATIC CANCER SERVICES WHERE THIS WILL DIRECTLY IMPROVE SERVICES AND SUPPORT FOR INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES LIVING WITH A DIAGNOSIS OF PANCREATIC CANCER OR PANCREATITIS, AND WHERE FUNDING WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE AVAILABLE. • SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO PANCREATIC CANCER WITH SELECTED GRANTS FOR RESEARCH TEAMS AND PANCREATIC CANCER PATIENTS PARTICIPATING IN CLINICAL TRIALS AND PROMOTING THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH. •RAISING AWARENESS OF PANCREATIC CANCER AND ITS EFFECTS. • PROVIDING FINANCIAL, PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO THOSE DIAGNOSED WITH PANCREATIC CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH APPROPRIATE REFERRAL AND SIGNPOSTING IN A WAY THAT WILL IMPROVE QUALITY OF LIFE. • WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER RELEVANT CHARITIES AND GROUPS TO ACHIEVE BETTER OUTCOMES FOR THOSE DIAGNOSED WITH PANCREATIC CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Thornton Court
Girton
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0NS
- Phone:
- 01223782171
- Email:
- info@ecfund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window