HOPTON REHAB & HOMING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote humane behaviour towards horses by providing appropriate care, protection, treatment and security for those which are in need of care and attention by reason of sickness, maltreatment, poor circumstances, through the provision of facilities for the reception, care and treatment of such animals and the rehoming of them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Holt | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Edward Clent | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
TRACY ELIZABETH COOPER | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.22k | £110.83k | £85.85k | £110.00k | £392.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.46k | £79.78k | £96.92k | £106.00k | £179.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £11.84k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS HORSES BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR THOSE WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND THE REHOMING OF THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Silver Birch Farm
Stottesdon
KIDDERMINSTER
Worcestershire
DY14 8NH
- Phone:
- 07456 661542
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window