CHARLIE'S WISH

Charity number: 1173965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We raise awareness about Desmoplastic Small Round Cell Tumour, a cancer that generally affects teenagers,at all fund-raising events within Sussex. Grants are given to a suitable research programme, chosen annually by the trustees, to improve treatments for this type of cancer.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 17 August 2023

Total income: £2,749
Total expenditure: £4,096

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNDA HILTON Chair 12 October 2016
None on record
Sera Cork Cork Trustee 03 April 2020
None on record
DAVID CHRISTOPHER HILTON Trustee 12 October 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, SOUTHWICK
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/08/2019 17/08/2020 17/08/2021 17/08/2022 17/08/2023
Total gross income £2.42k £3.10k £1.83k £2.25k £2.75k
Total expenditure £4.00k £0 £5.00k £96 £4.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 17 August 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 17 August 2022 07 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 17 August 2021 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 17 August 2020 14 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 17 August 2019 14 June 2021 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 78
Coates Court
Butts Road
Southwick
Brighton
BN42 4DS
Phone:
07598468897