CEREBRAL PALSY UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide football activities (training, coaching, mentoring, refereeing and playing) for children and adults with Cerebral Palsy and /or Aquired Brain Injury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 November 2017: CIO registration
- CP UTD FC (Working name)
- CPUFC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Wilcock | Chair | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Balmer | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Morgan | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Carl Carter | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALICE CORDELIA FERREBE | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ANDREW TRAFFORD | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.02k | £54.02k | £40.63k | £66.18k | £70.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.08k | £47.08k | £61.00k | £48.94k | £48.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO PLAY FOOTBALL INCLUDING COACHING FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH CEREBRAL PALSY AND ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH CEREBRAL PALSY AND ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURIES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Prescott Street
Golborne
WARRINGTON
WA3 3FT
- Phone:
- 07815458550
- Email:
- info@cpunited.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window