TANYEL'S SMILE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping young children age 0-24 diagnosed with cancer in North cyprus at the Oncology unit at Devlet hastanesi Nicosia and seeking advise from Kemal Saracoglu vakfi.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cyprus
Governance
- 22 June 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GULAY UZUN | Chair | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CEYHUN UZUN | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
HULYA MEHMET | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
REMZIYE CESUROGLU | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE JANE LOGAN | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE LODGE | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.21k | £5.36k | £8.89k | £4.42k | £18.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.01k | £3.25k | £5.28k | £7.50k | £18.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN SUFFERERING FROM CANCER AND THEIR FAMIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THEIR BENEFIT IN EITHER THE"ONKOLOJI HASTANESI) ONCOLOGY HOSPITAL CHILDREN'S WARD IN NICOSIA NORTH CYPRUS OR AT "UMUT EGITIM VE KULTUR EVI" HOPE AND EDUCATION CENTRE IN NICOSIA NORTH CYPRUS. (B) PROVIDING GRANTS TO FAMILIES AND CARERS OF THOSE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM CANCER IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ITEMS TO ASSIST THEIR EMOTIONAL WELLBEING OR PROVIDING THE MEANS FOR A RESOITE BREAK FOR THE WHOLE FAMILY. (C) PROVIDING FUNDING TO THE HOPE AND EDUCATION CENTRE FOR EQUIPMENT OR OTHER FACILITIES REQUIRED IN THE CENTRE. (D) BY FUNDING ANY OTHER CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS THAT PROVIDE SUPPORT OR CARE TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE SUFFERING WITH CANCER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Gordon Road
SIDCUP
DA15 8SX
- Phone:
- 07941053711
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window