ROLLESTON-ON-DOVE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve the quality of life of the community. To further the education of women to enable them to contribute to society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 14 January 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheila Lord | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fraser | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Murphy | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Thompson | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jillienne Hodge | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jacks | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Cook | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Johns | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Barnett | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Harding | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 18 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.94k | £6.91k | £9.17k | £7.32k | £6.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.47k | £6.79k | £6.50k | £10.09k | £6.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODELD CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
ROLLESTON-ON-DOVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Meadow View
Rolleston-On-Dove
BURTON-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
DE13 9AN
- Phone:
- 07807059517
- Email:
- diane.johns57@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window