RUSH 2THE DEN TOTS & ADULTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RUSH 2The DEN is a unique place run by very dedicated DBS checked volunteers open 9.15am - 2.45pm Monday to Friday so you can drop in around your routine for Babies, Tots & Adults including, messy play, soft play sensory play Crafty Fingers (arts & crafts) and Play Days.A place where you are welcomed with a cuppa, juice & biscuit. where you can relax & enjoy your quality time with your little one
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 12 April 2017: CIO registration
- 05 August 2024: Funds received from 1196024 THE ALTR GROUP CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NINA ROBINSON | Chair | 28 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Emma Louise Swingler | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Noah Middleton | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julie Clare Guneratne | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN KIDMAN | Trustee | 28 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.93k | £27.22k | £12.94k | £16.99k | £18.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.23k | £29.30k | £14.84k | £17.49k | £20.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS, AND IN PARTICULAR TO: A) PROMOTE THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; B) PROMOTE THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTE PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; C) PROMOTE THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; D) PROVIDE SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUSH 2The DEN
Fitzwilliam Street
Rushden
Northamptonshire
NN10 9YW
- Phone:
- 01933 770450
- Email:
- tots.rush2theden@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window