WINTHORPE COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Winthorpe Community Partnership is a resident led collaboration between residents and service providers from NHS, Council, Police, Housing Association an others with the aims of providing the community with more choice, more opportunities and increase local knowledge and skills to make our community a happier healthy inclusive place to live.Along side all of this we run clubs and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £40,375 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 27 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Graham Philip Miles | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Sadesh Gungah | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CARL JAMES FREEMAN | Trustee | 04 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
CARL STUART MACEY | Trustee | 04 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARY METCALFE | Trustee | 04 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.37k | £27.57k | £33.91k | £38.16k | £63.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.25k | £62.44k | £28.93k | £39.94k | £46.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £395 | £1.16k | £4.75k | £500 | £40.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 174 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 209 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT (THE VILLAGE OF WINTHORPE, EAST LINDSEY, LINCOLNSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND SUPPORT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2 TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; 3.3 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008
Area of benefit
LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 FAINLIGHT CLOSE
ROMAN BANK
SKEGNESS
PE25 1SU
- Phone:
- 07738997000
- Email:
- jodibrad80@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window