PHOENIX FRENCH BULLDOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
'Raising Frenchies from the Ashes, with TLC' Phoenix French Bulldog Rescue has been established not only to offer a home to any Frenchie (or crossbreeds thereof) in need, but also to educate the public on this wonderful breed, promote good ownership and to help keep Frenchies at home with their families wherever possible. To promote the health and welfare of the breed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 March 2017: CIO registration
- PFBR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERESA L CARGILL | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLEIGH LOUISE DHILLON | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ALLEN CARGILL | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.09k | £128.15k | £151.44k | £111.65k | £128.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.48k | £115.80k | £163.30k | £107.09k | £128.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 15 March 2024 | 408 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 15 March 2024 | 408 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 31 January 2023 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 31 January 2023 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
Ò FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF FRENCH BULLDOGS, INCLUDING CROSS-BREEDS THEREOF, IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS; Ò FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO OFFER TEMPORARY LONG-TERM FOSTER CARE TO THE FRENCH BULLDOG BREEDS OF VICTIMS OF ABUSE WHO MAY NEED TO ENTER SAFE-HOUSES BUT ARE UNABLE TO TAKE THEIR DOGS, AND TO LIAISE WITH OTHER BREED RESCUES WHERE OTHER BREEDS MAY BE PRESENT AND REQUIRE SIMILAR Ò TO LIAISE WITH OTHER BREED RESCUES AND BREEDERS TO ESTABLISH A REPORTING PROGRAM FOR SURRENDERED DOGS WHERE A MICROCHIP EXISTS AND THIS INFORMATION IS AVAILABLE FOR THE PURPOSES OF REUNIFICATION Ò TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, ESPECIALLY THOSE OF THE FRENCH BULLDOG BREED BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND FRENCH BULLDOGS IN PARTICULAR, AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 WELLINGTON ROAD
SHORTSTOWN
BEDFORD
MK42 0UT
- Phone:
- 03007727716
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window