Financial history HARPHAM & LOWTHORPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1173734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.92k £19.95k £29.83k £18.50k £24.28k
Total expenditure £4.68k £4.49k £12.70k £51.75k £29.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.47k £19.63k £26.31k N/A £18.10k