EAST STOCKWITH AND WALKERITH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The funds resulting from the sale of the Village Hall in 2007 are (in accordance with the Trust Deed) to be used to improve the conditions of life for the Area of Benefit (The village of East Stockwith and the hamlet of Walkerith). Future activities will include the provision of amenities to enhance the lives of all residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 18 January 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLARE ANN BUCKLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Philip Victor Simpson | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Neil Vernon | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Forington | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN FORINGTON | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE L BAKER | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS CHRIS CONNOLLY | Trustee | 12 March 2007 |
|
|
||||
JAMES FRANK METCALFE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £846 | £637 | £637 | £439 | £1.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235 | £5.00k | £5.00k | £12.58k | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED THE 7 MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF EAST STOCKWITH AND THE HAMLET OF WALKERWITH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPTION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTSS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EAST STOCKWITH AND THE HAMLET OF WALKERWITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Edgehill Drive
Newark
Newark
Nottinghamshire
NG24 2GP
- Phone:
- 07773905203
- Email:
- clare.11@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window