NORTH LINCS TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A fortnightly magazine and newspaper on audio tape or CD covering the towns and villages of North Lincs. It is available to anyone with difficulty reading a standard newspaper due to visual impairment or physical disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 30 January 1980: Standard registration
- 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 September 2014: Re-registered
- NORTH LINCS TALKING NEWS (Working name)
- SCUNTHORPE AND AREA TALKING MAGAZINE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- SCUNTHORPE TALKING MAGAZINE FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Thompson | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Phil Rudderforth | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charles Bratton | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD BUCKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40 | £33 | £264 | £60 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.16k | £2.22k | £1.73k | £1.63k | £1.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED 23 NOVEMBER 1982, 20 APRIL 1994, 19TH APRIL 1995, 20 MARCH 2000 AND 7 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY PROVIDING RECORDED TAPES OR TACTILE READING MATTER FOR THE USE OF SUCH PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 HENRY STREET
SCUNTHORPE
DN15 7QG
- Phone:
- 01724840211
- Email:
- Editor@nltn.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window