COETMOR MILL TRUST

Charity number: 1172211
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £17,575
Total expenditure: £12,898

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gwynedd

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Henson Chair 22 March 2017
None on record
David Arthur Cox Trustee 02 April 2019
ELSTREE AND DISTRICT SCOUTS
Received: On time
1ST ELSTREE AND BOREHAMWOOD SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
CHRISTINE SNELLING-NASH Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record
ANDREW RICE Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record
BRUCE MCFARLANE Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record
PATRICIA HALL Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record
Kim Henson Trustee 22 March 2017
BISHOP'S STORTFORD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.48k £22.61k £18.19k £22.23k £17.58k
Total expenditure £14.53k £5.92k £23.29k £22.63k £12.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 February 2025 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 November 2024 281 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 November 2024 281 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Monkswood Drive
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
CM23 4LH
Phone:
07736770736
Website:

coetmormill.co.uk