RECONCILIATION INITIATIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's main project is to deliver a learning and development programme for church leaders called Reconciling Mission. The purpose of the Reconciling Mission programme is to equip and resource participants for envisioning and emboldening Anglican Christians and their churches to engage more deeply with their neighbours, and to contribute to reconciliation across inequalities in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Kenya
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Andrew Westwood | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Ruwani Gunawardene | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Akeem Adagbada | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Hartley Wolstenholme | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Ven. Moira Ann Elizabeth Astin | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Jonathan Cracknell Simmons | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.24k | £97.98k | £71.61k | £85.12k | £70.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.10k | £38.93k | £67.46k | £81.90k | £81.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR THE GOSPEL OF REDEMPTION AND RECONCILIATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY EVERY AVAILABLE MEANS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF CHRISTIAN RELATIONSHIP, COMMUNITY BUILDING, PEACEMAKING AND RECONCILIATION; AND (II) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE, THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, CONSULTANCY AND OTHER SERVICES, TO CHRISTIAN CHURCH LEADERS, MEMBERS AND OTHERS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THOSE CHRISTIANS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF CHURCHES WITHIN THE WORLD-WIDE ANGLICAN COMMUNION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Howey Close
Malvern
Worcestershire
WR14 1WB
- Phone:
- 07838096203
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window