Financial history MAKE IT BEAT

Charity Number: 1173304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £220 £33.87k £6.78k £5.04k £5.04k
Total expenditure £5.80k £30.97k £20.81k £1.50k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.20k N/A N/A N/A