LIVERPOOL VETERANS HQ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide support to ex forces personnel reservists and their families across the north west of England. Veterans HQ can provide access to emotional and well being support, practical assistance with housing, employment, training, debt and benefit, job search etc. Veterans HQ has a fully dedicated Custody Co-ordinator and a full time families officer and a team of trained and dedicated buddies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Cumbria
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Sefton
Governance
- 28 April 2017: CIO registration
- 19 March 2019: Funds received from 1128314 KSA EDUCATION & TRAINING
- LIVERPOOL VETERANS PROJECT HQ (Working name)
- LVP HQ (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steph Harper | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Martin | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Cox QVRM VR | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Fazakerley | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEIL MEADOWS | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.30k | £320.46k | £304.17k | £301.37k | £201.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.45k | £234.10k | £140.45k | £133.67k | £139.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.35k | £40.00k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS:- FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE BY CHARITABLE MEANS, THE NEEDS OF VETERANS AND RESERVISTS OF HM FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE LIVERPOOL AND SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE SUFFERING ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR ANY OTHER SUCH SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE, WITH THE ULTIMATE AIM OF ENABLING THEIR INDEPENDENCE. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING A SINGLE POINT OF CONTACT TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF PHYSICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL, PRACTICAL SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ENCOURAGEMENT TO RELIEVE DISTRESS, ILLNESS OR HARDSHIP. B) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING WELL-BEING, SELF-ESTEEM, SELF-CONFIDENCE AND AIDING TRANSITION BACK INTO LOCAL SOCIETY AND CIVILIAN LIFE. C) PROVIDING OR ARRANGING PROVISION OF EDUCATION, VOCATIONAL SKILLS TRAINING OR OTHER ASSISTANCE AND TO CREATE AND FACILITATE JOB OPPORTUNITIES ALONG WITH ASSISTANCE IN PREPARING FOR AND FINDING EMPLOYMENT. D) PROVIDE SUPPORT AND INFORMATION ON REHABILITATION FROM DRUG & ALCOHOL ADDICTION. E) PROVIDING SUITABLE SHORT AND LONG TERM ACCOMMODATION F) PROVIDING DOMICILIARY CARE AND SUPPORTED LIVING SERVICES G) DO ALL SUCH LAWFUL THINGS THAT MAY FURTHER THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Veterans HQ
28 St. Domingo Vale
LIVERPOOL
Merseyside
England
L5 6RW
- Phone:
- 01512619878
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window