CAMBRIDGE REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT CAMPAIGN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cambridge Refugee Resettlement Campaign provides a wide range of practical support to beneficiaries, and liaises with local stakeholders. CRRC works closely with the County Councils, City Councils, local charities, and other organisations that support and campaign around refugees, and enables the people of Cambridgeshire to volunteer to support refugees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 May 2017: CIO registration
- 05 August 2021: Funds received from 1166131 EDLUMINO EDUCATION AID
- CRRC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Jane Coates | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adriana Sandu | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aryan Frahmand | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aisha Shuamazzi | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Khalil Abu-Dahab | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrii Smytsniuk | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Christine Santhosham | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Matthews | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Lucy Walston | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|||||
SUSAN MARGARET SPENCER | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.16k | £46.57k | £61.34k | £109.61k | £77.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.50k | £29.49k | £57.87k | £95.10k | £76.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 May 2017
Charitable objects
CAMBRIDGE REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT CAMPAIGN (CRRC) IS SET UP FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BECOME DISPLACED PERSONS OR REFUGEES FROM THE COUNTRIES OF THEIR ORIGIN OR DOMICILE BY REASON OF HOSTILITIES, PERSECUTION, OPPRESSION, DISCRIMINATION, NATURAL DISASTERS OR OTHER LIKE CAUSES, INCLUDING THROUGH THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING, AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT ISSUES RELATING TO PERSONS WHO HAVE BECOME DISPLACED PERSONS OR REFUGEES FROM THE COUNTRIES OF THEIR ORIGIN OR DOMICILE BY REASON OF HOSTILITIES, PERSECUTION, OPPRESSION, DISCRIMINATION, NATURAL DISASTERS OR OTHER LIKE CAUSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CRRC c/o
Friends Meeting House
12 Jesus Lane
CAMBRIDGE
CB5 8BA
- Phone:
- 07999599390
- Email:
- info@cambridgerefugees.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window