ENVIRONMENTAL DEVELOPMENT INITIATIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Environmental Development Initiatives is currently building a website and social media presence as a platform for attracting interest in our goals and ideals, as well as collecting donations from the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2019
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Namibia
Governance
- 11 May 2017: CIO registration
- EDI (Working name)
- ENVIRONMENTAL DEVLOPMENT INITIATIVES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Krall | Trustee | 17 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Quinn | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
IDS VAN SOLKEMA | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
BLAKE FEZZA | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
HENRY WILLSON | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN KYLE | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £270 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £257 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 May 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; (D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATED TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS".
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Exhall Close
Stratford-upon-Avon
CV37 7HE
- Phone:
- 07936362335
- Email:
- outreach@edi.fund
- Website:
-
edi.fund
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window