Trustees SIRI GURU SINGH SABHA GURDWARA, BRISTOL
Charity number: 1180348

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Davinder Singh Matharu | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sucha Singh | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bhabinder Singh Dulay | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
NARINDER KAUR | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harpreet Singh Klair | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harbir Kaur Bal | Trustee | 11 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Santokh Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sukhdeep Kaur | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lamber Singh Voual | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Parmjit Kaur | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sukhpal Singh Bal | Trustee | 07 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jagmohan Singh Gill | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nirmal Kaur Bal | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
GURDIAL SINGH | Trustee | 19 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.