STREETS AHEAD FOR INFORMATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Streets Ahead for Information is a small, not-for-profit constituted voluntary organisation that was established in 2006 and works in one of the most deprived communities in the UK, in the densely urbanised area of Gresham and Newport, Middlesbrough, Teesside. We operate on the main thoroughfare, occupying a corner plot which has a downstairs drop-in centre and a small preloved shop
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 August 2023
Total income includes £18,758 from 1 government contract(s) and £6,530 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Middlesbrough
Governance
- 24 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Mallam | Trustee | 16 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ELLIS | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
LYNN MULLINS | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHLOE BAXTER | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tania Johnson | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr RENNIE MAY | Trustee | 24 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/08/2019 | 23/08/2020 | 23/08/2021 | 23/08/2022 | 23/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.49k | £106.21k | £196.73k | £131.20k | £117.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.73k | £142.40k | £140.14k | £116.18k | £136.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.76k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.85k | £21.70k | £33.67k | £22.68k | £6.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 August 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 August 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 August 2021 | 30 July 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 August 2021 | 30 July 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 August 2020 | 18 July 2022 | 390 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 August 2020 | 18 July 2022 | 390 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 August 2019 | 30 October 2020 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 August 2019 | 30 October 2020 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS (I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GRESHAM IN MIDDLESBROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND (II) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF GRESHAM IN MIDDLESBROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
109-111 PARLIAMENT ROAD
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS1 4JE
- Phone:
- 01642803451
- Email:
- streets-ahead@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
streetsaheadforinformation.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window