VILLAGE HALL, MARBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 28 November 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Griffiths | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Owen | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marian Turnbull | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
jill shakeshaft | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
janet gibbs | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET MAKIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.31k | £21.80k | £1.52k | £3.38k | £6.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.33k | £9.21k | £3.04k | £3.65k | £4.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 8 JUNE 1946 AND RULES ADOPTED JUNE 1975 AS AMENDED 15 JUNE 1988.
Charitable objects
FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL INTERCOURSE AND TO SERVE ANY RELIGIOUS EDUCATIONAL OR CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE ADVANTAGE OR BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MARBURY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MARBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holly Cottage, Marbury Hall Barns
Marbury
Whitchurch
Whitchurch
SY13 4LN
- Phone:
- 07885677384
- Email:
- hannahowenuk@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window