Financial history ENABLING INDEPENDENCE SERVICE

Charity Number: 1172286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.28k £43.96k £21.47k £32.25k £19.84k
Total expenditure £24.34k £26.44k £28.19k £31.33k £31.54k
Income from government contracts N/A £25.00k £18.75k £25.55k £19.08k
Income from government grants £20.83k £16.71k N/A N/A N/A