CYFEILLION CERDD IEUENCTID GWYNEDD/FRIENDS OF GWYNEDD YOUTH MUSIC
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support musical activities for children and young people (up to 25 years of age) in Gwynedd
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 08 February 1980: Standard registration
- 17 May 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 17 May 2022: Funds transferred to 1084271 CANOLFAN GERDD WILLIAM MATHIAS CYF
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.41k | £3.61k | £841 | £644 | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.60k | £850 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 08 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AT PUBLIC MEETING ON 17 JANUARY 1980 AS AMENDED 2 MAY 2001 & 16 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGEOF 25 YEARS WHO ARE ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN OR WHO RECEIVE EDUCATION WITHIN THE COUNTY OF GWYNEDD BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, AMENITIES OR ASSISTANCE NOT PROVIDED OR NOT ADEQUATELY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE (2) OF THE CONSTITUTION).RE5
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF GWYNEDD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window